Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCABLE NEWS NETWORK v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01626
Date Filed2019-06-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffCABLE NEWS NETWORK
Case DescriptionCable News Network reporter Katelyn Polantz submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning interviews conducted as part of the Mueller investigation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the receipt and told Polantz that her request qualified for unusual circumstances. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CNN filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-041COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6163771) filed by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-043NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Kelley on behalf of CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-05Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-054SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/5/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/5/2019. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/05/2019. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-137RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 6/10/2019 (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-07-038NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Danielle Enlow on behalf of All Defendants (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-039NOTICE of Filing Motion for Consolidation by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-0510ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-1511NOTICE of Filing Opposition to Consolidation by CABLE NEWS NETWORK re 9 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 CNN Opposition to Consolidation)(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-1612NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Opposition to Consolidation by CABLE NEWS NETWORK (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 CNN's Supplemental Opposition to Consolidation)(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar