Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRyan, LLC v. U.S. Department of the Interior et al
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityHouston
Case Number4:2019cv02003
Date Filed2019-06-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Andrew S Hanen
PlaintiffRyan, LLC
Case DescriptionRyan, LLC, an accounting firm with clients in the oil and gas industry, filed a reverse-FOIA suit against the Department of the Interior to prevent the agency from disclosing allegedly proprietary information about Ryan's clients as part of the Inspector General's investigation of royalty refund claims. The agency received a third-party request for the investigative file and after Ryan was unable to get the agency to commit to protecting is confidential information, Ryan filed suit to block disclosure of its records.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Reverse-FOIA - Confidential business information

DefendantUS Department of the Interior
DefendantOffice of Inspector General of the US Department of the Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-041COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0541-22548839) filed by Ryan, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dumesnil, Bryan) Payment information added on 6/4/2019 (ltien, 4). (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-052ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/6/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar