Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01647
Date Filed2019-06-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED, INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzfeed reporter Jason Leopold submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, ten components of the agency, and the National Security Agency for records concerning actions taken by Attorney General William Barr or Deputy Attorney General Rod Rosenstein pertaining to the Mueller investigation of Russian interference in the 2016 Presidential election. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL
DefendantDOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL
DefendantDOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantDOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION
DefendantDOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL POLICY
DefendantDOJ OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL
DefendantDOJ OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS
DefendantDOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION
DefendantDOJ OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS
DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-051COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6167232) filed by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-052NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-053LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-06Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-064SUMMONS (13) Issued Electronically as to DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL POLICY, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS, DOJ OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-075STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 7, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-07-086RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION served on 6/18/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-087RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL served on 6/18/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-088RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION served on 6/18/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-089RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL served on 6/18/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-0810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL served on 6/18/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-0811RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS served on 6/18/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-0812RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL POLICY served on 6/18/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-0813RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS served on 6/21/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-0814RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL served on 6/18/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-0815RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 6/24/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-0816RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY served on 6/19/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-0817RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/18/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-0818RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/18/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/18/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-0819RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/18/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-1220Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL POLICY, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS, DOJ OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-15MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Accordingly, by August 19, 2019, the defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs' 1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 15, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 8/19/2019. (tg) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-08-0621NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-1922ANSWER to Complaint by DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL POLICY, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS, DOJ OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/19/2019)
2019-09-24MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE, by October 8, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.23. The parties should have filed a joint meet and confer statement within 30 days of the defendants' 22 Answer, as required by the 5 Standing Order. Failure to comply with this order will result in this action being dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 24, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to show cause due by 10/8/2019. (tg) (Entered: 09/25/2019)
2019-10-0823RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, Plaintiffs' Response to Order to Show Cause filed by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Status Report, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-09MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DISCHARGING the Court's September 24, 2019 Minute Order To Show Cause in light of the plaintiff's 23 Response to Order of the Court, and DIRECTING the parties to file, by December 20, 2019, a joint status report with proposed schedules for the production of responsive records and the filing of any dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 9, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2019. (tg) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-12-1724Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DOJ CRIMINAL DIVISION, DOJ DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, DOJ OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGAL POLICY, DOJ OFFICE OF LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS, DOJ OFFICE OF PUBLIC AFFAIRS, DOJ OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, DOJ OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-17MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 24 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. Accordingly, the parties shall file a joint status report with proposed schedules for the production of responsive records and the filing of any dispositive motions by December 24, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 17, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/24/2019. (tg) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-2325Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-23MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 25 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by March 31, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 23, 2019. (lcbah3) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/31/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2020-03-3126Joint STATUS REPORT on Behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-04-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 26 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by June 30, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 1, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2020. (tg) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-06-3027Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-07-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 27 Fourth Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by September 10, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 1, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report due by 9/10/2020. (ztg) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-09-1028Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-11MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 28 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by November 6, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule for further proceeding. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 11, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2020. (ztg) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-11-0629Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-06MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 29 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by January 15, 2021, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 6, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report due by 1/15/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2021-01-1530Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-15MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 30 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by March 12, 2021, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 15, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/12/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-03-1231Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-12MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 31 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by May 14, 2021, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 12, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/14/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-05-1432Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/14/2021)
2021-05-14MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 32 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by July 16, 2021, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 14, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/14/2021)
2021-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 05/17/2021)
2021-07-1633Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-07-16MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 33 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by September 16, 2021, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 16, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-07-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 07/16/2021)
2021-09-1634Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-17MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 34 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by November 18, 2021, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 17, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/18/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 09/20/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar