Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENVIRONMENTAL AND ANIMAL DEFENSE v. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01663
Date Filed2019-06-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffENVIRONMENTAL AND ANIMAL DEFENSE
Case DescriptionEnvironmental and Animal Defense submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning the proposed Forest Lakes Development Project by Classic Homes in El Paso County, Colorado. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and disclosed a sampling of 12 documents to EAD. But after hearing nothing further from the agency, EAD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
1849 C Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20240
DefendantU.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-061COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6171859) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL AND ANIMAL DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. FWS, # 4 Summons U.S. DOI, # 5 Summons U.S. Civil Process Clerk)(McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENVIRONMENTAL AND ANIMAL DEFENSE (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
2019-06-10Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-103SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-194NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Marie Carreno on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL AND ANIMAL DEFENSE (Carreno, Alexa) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/17/2019. (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 6/14/2019 (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-247RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/17/2019. (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 6/14/2019 (McKay, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-07-129NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-1210Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-12MINUTE ORDER: Granting 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by August 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/12/19. (DJS) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/16/2019. (tb) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar