Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWang v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2019cv03179
Date Filed2019-06-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffMichael Wang
Case DescriptionMichael Wang submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning an investigation involving him. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Wang contacted the agency for an estimated completion date. The agency told him it would take 475 days to process his request. Wang then asked for expedited processing, telling the agency that he needed the records to defend his job as a police officer. The agency then told Wang that it had located 5,000 potentially responsive records and that fees would be incurred. Wang contacted the agency several more times for a completion date, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Wang filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-071COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against United States Department of Justice (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13416421.). Filed by Michael Wang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/7/2019) Modified on 6/10/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-072Proposed Summons. (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/7/2019) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-073Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/21/2019. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-104Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/30/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-105Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-116Proposed Summons. (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/11/2019) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-117CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Wang.. (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/11/2019) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-118Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-129Proposed Summons. (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-2110Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-2511SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Michael Wang. United States Department of Justice served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/25/2019. (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-2512SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Michael Wang. Service on the U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of California (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-2513SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Michael Wang. Service on the United States Attorney General (Pifari, Nicole) (Filed on 6/25/2019) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-07-1514NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Zack (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/15/2019) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-1515STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, to Extend Time Within Which to Answer or Respond filed by United States Department of Justice. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/15/2019) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-1516CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of Justice.. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 7/15/2019) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-1617ORDER GRANTING re 15 Stipulation to Extend Time Within Which to Answer or Respond filed by United States Department of Justice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/16/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar