Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOliver B. Mitchell III v. Secretary, United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2019cv05036
Date Filed2019-06-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael W. Fitzgerald
PlaintiffOliver B Mitchell, III
Case DescriptionOliver Mitchell submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning his dental care at the VA Medical Center in Los Angeles. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Mitchell filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSecretary, United States Department of Veterans Affairs
DefendantAnn Brown Director, Greater Los Angeles VA Medical Center
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-101COMPLAINT against Defendants Ann Brown, Secretary, United States Department of Veterans Affairs.Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver, filed by plaintiff Oliver B Mitchell, III. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (car) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-102CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Oliver B Mitchell, III (car) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-103REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Oliver B Mitchell, III. (car) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-104NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-105NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-116ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: granting 3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (dml) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-07-087REQUEST FOR SERVICE BY MARSHAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(e)(3) AND 28 U.S.C. 1915(d) filed by Plaintiff Oliver B Mitchell, III. (iv) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar