Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEADER v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01679
Date Filed2019-06-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffELISABETH LEADER
Case DescriptionElizabeth Leader submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records concerning her father, John Louis Leader, who had served with the CIA and the Office of Strategic Services. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Two years later, the agency denied the request. Leader filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Leader filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-101COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6177061) filed by ELISABETH LEADER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-11Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-11SUMMONS Not Issued as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-122REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ELISABETH LEADER.(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent) (tth) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-07-094NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-185Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-19MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's 1 Complaint on or before August 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 19, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar