Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01685
Date Filed2019-06-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES
Case DescriptionEnergy Policy Advocates submitted four FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning a certain individual who had left the agency. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, EPA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-101COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6177074) filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Request for Summons DoI, # 3 Summons Request for Summons DoJ, # 4 Summons Request for Summons USADC, # 5 Declaration Consent to Magistrate, # 6 Declaration LCvR 26.1 Declaration)(Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-103NOTICE of Consent to a Magistrate Judge by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES re 1 Complaint. (zef, ) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-11Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-114SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-115STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/11/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/17/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/17/2019. (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/17/2019. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 6/14/2019. (See Docket Entry 6 to view document) (tth) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-168NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-169ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-17MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on August 15, 2019, at 11:35 a.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 07/17/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-17Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/15/2019, at 11:35 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar