Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCentral Laborers' Pension Fund v. United States Army Contracting Command Rock Island Arsenal
DistrictCentral District of Illinois
CitySpringfield
Case Number3:2019cv03153
Date Filed2019-06-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Sue E. Myerscough
PlaintiffCentral Laborers' Pension Fund
Case DescriptionThe Central Laborers' Pension Fund submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Army Contracting Command at Rock Island Arsenal for records concerning construction work performed by Williams Construction at the RI Arsenal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the Pension Fund that it was providing Williams Construction an opportunity to make confidentiality claims. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Penson Fund filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Army Contracting Command Rock Island Arsenal
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-101COMPLAINT FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO THE FREEDOM OF INFORMATION ACT against United States Army Contracting Command Rock Island Arsenal ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3124172.), filed by Central Laborers' Pension Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Wolters, John) (Attachment 4 replaced on 6/10/2019) (ME, ilcd). (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/10/2019) (ME, ilcd). (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-102CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Central Laborers' Pension Fund. (Wolters, John) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-10Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification re [1-4] Summons, [1-3] Civil Cover Sheet : Documents properly converted to Adobe and replaced. (ME, ilcd) Modified on 6/10/2019 to add civil cover sheet info. (ME, ilcd). (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-103Summons Issued as to United States Army Contracting Command Rock Island Arsenal and returned by U.S. mail to Plaintiff's counsel to effectuate service. (ME, ilcd) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-14TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Judge Schanzle-Haskins disqualifies himself and recuses himself from participation in this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(4). Pursuant to instructions from Chief Judge James E. Shadid, this matter is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Eric Long. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 6/12/2019. (MAS, ilcd) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-14Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins no longer assigned to the case. (MAS, ilcd) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-204SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central Laborers' Pension Fund. United States Army Contracting Command Rock Island Arsenal served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Wolters, John) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar