Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01698
Date Filed2019-06-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning re-delegation orders pertaining to filling vacancies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-111COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6180087) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Summons agency summons, # 3 Summons AG summons, # 4 Summons USAO DC Summons, # 5 Declaration 7.1 disclosure)(Jenkins, Peter) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/11/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-12Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-07-174NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-175ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-186ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before August 1, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Please see the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/18/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar