Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGANDHI v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01701
Date Filed2019-06-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffASHVIN DHIREN GANDHI
Case DescriptionAshvin Gandhi submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning Payroll Based Journal database data collected since 2015. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency indicated that fees would be incurred in processing the request. Gandhi then asked for a fee waiver. Gandhi had a number of contacts with CMS pertaining to the scope of his request and its potential costs. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Gandhi filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-111COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6180482) filed by ASHVIN DHIREN GANDHI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-112REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ASHVIN DHIREN GANDHI.(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-12Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-06-123SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
2019-07-174ANSWER to Complaint by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-185ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before August 1, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Please see the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/18/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar