Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Legacy Foundation v. Department Of Defense
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2019cv00758
Date Filed2019-06-11
Date Closed2019-07-02
JudgeDistrict Judge Leonie M. Brinkema
PlaintiffThe Legacy Foundation
DefendantDepartment Of Defense
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-111Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6684154.), filed by The Legacy Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix A, # 2 Appendix Appendix B, # 3 Appendix Appendix C, # 4 Appendix Appendix D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Torchinsky, Jason) (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/11/2019) (jlan, ). (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-112Proposed Summons Department of Defense by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-113Proposed Summons Department of Justice by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-114Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-115Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-11Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (jlan) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-116Summons Issued as to Department Of Defense, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(jlan) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-287MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Department Of Defense. (McCotter, R.) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-288Memorandum in Support re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Department Of Defense. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Final Response)(McCotter, R.) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-289Notice of Hearing Date set for JULY 19, 2019 re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (McCotter, R.) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-01Set Deadlines as to 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-0210NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by The Legacy Foundation (Torchinsky, Jason) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-0211So Ordered in re 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by The Legacy Foundation. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/02/2019. (jlan) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar