Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING et al v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01726
Date Filed2019-06-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffCENTER FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING
PlaintiffMATTHEW SMITH
Case DescriptionMatthew Smith, a staff reporter at the Center for Investigative Reporting, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the extent to which the U.S. has intervened on behalf of American business interests into the investigation of former Ukrainian President Yanukovych on corruption charges. CIR also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted CIR's request for a fee waiver. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, CIR and Smith filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
2201 C Street, NW
DC, DC 20520
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-131COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6186635) filed by CENTER FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING, Matthew Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to 3 to complaint)(Clopper, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/14/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING (Clopper, John) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/14/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-14Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-143SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-144STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 06/14/2019. (lctnm2) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-265AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to U.S. Department of State by CENTER FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING, MATTHEW SMITH. (Clopper, John) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-266AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to U.S. Attorney General by CENTER FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING, MATTHEW SMITH. (Clopper, John) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-267AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia by CENTER FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING, MATTHEW SMITH. (Clopper, John) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-268RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/18/2019. (Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/18/2019.) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/18/2019. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 6/20/2019. (See docket entries 5 6 and 7 to view document). (tth) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-189NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-1810ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Valdez, Darrell) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-19MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a Complaint and an Answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before August 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/19/2019. (lctnm2) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar