Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEdward Dean Hohner v. U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2019cv05100
Date Filed2019-06-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge George H. Wu
PlaintiffEdward Dean Hohner
Case DescriptionEdward Hochner submitted FOIA requests to various components of the Department of Justice for records concerning DOJ paid informant Juston Hamilton, who was identified as an informant at Hochner's trial. The components issued Glomar responses neither confirming nor denying the existence of records. Hochner filed administrative appeals of those decisions, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hochner filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantU.S. Department of Justie U.S. Immigration and Customs Service
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice U.S. Immigration and Customs Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-12LODGED COMPLAINT sought to be filed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner. (lh) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-121NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to Upon submission of your complaint it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action will be dismissed and the file closed. If you submit the CV-60P form or pay the filing fee within THIRTY DAYS, your case will be filed. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. Re Lodged Complaint (Attachments: # 1 CV-60P) (lh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2019: # 2 Lodged Complaint) (lh). (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-07-082FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $400.00 filing fee from Edward Dean Hohner. Re: Notice Re: Discrepancies with Lodging of Complaint (CV-47P),,, 1 . Receipt number LA191582. (ek) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-093COMPLAINT against Defendants U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Immigration and Customs Service.Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver.(Filing fee $ 400 Paid), filed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner. (lh) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-094NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-095NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-096STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-107ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-02669 GW(PLAx). Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05100 GW(PLAx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-178Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar