Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFriends of Animals v. United States Bureau of Land Management
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2019cv01728
Date Filed2019-06-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak
PlaintiffFriends of Animals
Case DescriptionFriends of Animals submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records from the agency's field offices in Oregon and Washington pertaining to the euthanization of wild horses and burros in Oregon. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Friends of Animals filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Bureau of Land Management an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-131COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6741573)Attorney Courtney Renee McVean added to party Friends of Animals(pty:pla), filed by Friends of Animals. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McVean, Courtney) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-132Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-133SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, ) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-135ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Consent Form due by 8/5/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. On or before August 12, 2019, the parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order in the form required pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/13/19. (morti, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-144SUMMONS issued by Clerk for Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: # 1 Summons for William Barr) (rvill, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-07-086SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) United States Bureau of Land Management served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (McVean, Courtney) Modified on 7/9/2019 to correct Answer Deadline pursuant to FOIA(jgonz, ). (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-157NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Logan Ann Steiner on behalf of United States Bureau of Land ManagementAttorney Logan Ann Steiner added to party United States Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft) (Steiner, Logan) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-168ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Bureau of Land Management.(Steiner, Logan) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar