Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01743
Date Filed2019-06-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM
Case DescriptionThe Federation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning nine entities that resettle refugees and forms those entities submitted to the agency. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-141COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6190054) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (Casale, Ralph) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-17Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-07-104NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar