Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCommittee to Save the Huletts v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, et al.
DistrictNorthern District of Ohio
CityCleveland
Case Number1:2019cv01379
Date Filed2019-06-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher A. Boyko
PlaintiffCommittee to Save the Huletts A division of Citizens' Vision
Case DescriptionThe Committee to Save the Huletts submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Army Corps of Engineers for records concerning a permit granted for Cleveland Harbor. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told the Committee that processing its request would incur fees. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Committee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Army Corps of Engineers
DefendantTodd T. Semonite Lieutenant General
DefendantUnited States of America
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-141Complaint for Injunction and Declaratory Relief against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9365161. Filed by Committee to Save the Huletts. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A", FOIA request, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons US Army Corps of Engineers, # 4 Summons Lt. Gen. Todd T. Semonite, # 5 Summons United States of America) (Finley, David) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-14Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-14Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-142Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Todd T. Semonite, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-07-113Attorney Appearance by Lisa Hammond Johnson filed by on behalf of Todd T. Semonite, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, United States of America. (Johnson, Lisa) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-124Attorney Appearance by David M. DeVito filed by on behalf of Todd T. Semonite, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, United States of America. (DeVito, David) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar