Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01752
Date Filed2019-06-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Transportation for records concerning calendars and calendar entries for Secretary Elaine Chao and other senior officials. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6192501) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to USAO, # 3 Summons as to AG, # 4 Summons as to DOT)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-17Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-254REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT.(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-255SUMMONS (1) ReIssued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (ztd) Modified on 7/1/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-07-096RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/21/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/21/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/28/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 7/1/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar