Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDERNESS SOCIETY v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01802
Date Filed2019-06-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffWILDERNESS SOCIETY
Case DescriptionThe Wilderness Society submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior and the Department of Agriculture for records concerning the proposed mineral withdrawal of 224,000 acres of Superior National Forest in the Rainey River watershed. After several attempts to check on the status of its requests, the Bureau of Land Management provided an interim response of 249 pages. In response to its request to the Department of Agriculture, the Wilderness Society received an interim response from the Forest Service containing 47 pages with redactions under Exemption 5 (privileges) and Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). After hearing nothing further from either agency, the Wilderness Society filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DefendantU.S. FOREST SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-201COMPLAINT against U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FOREST SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6201143) filed by WILDERNESS SOCIETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney's Office, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Dept. of Interior, # 5 Summons U.S. Bureau of Land Management, # 6 Summons U.S. Department of Agriculture, # 7 Summons U.S. Forest Service)(Kenna, Matt) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/20/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-202LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDERNESS SOCIETY (Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-203MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Maya Kane, :Firm- Kane Law LLC, :Address- 10 Town Square, No. 422. Phone No. - (970) 946-5419. Fax No. - n/a Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6202442. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILDERNESS SOCIETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Maya Kane, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kenna, Matt) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-20Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-204SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FOREST SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-21MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Maya L. Kane is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/21/2019. (lctjk3) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/26/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/26/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Proof of Service)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/2/2019) (znmw). (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-286RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/26/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Proof of Service)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/2/2019) (znmw). (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 6/25/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Proof of Service)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/2/2019) (znmw). (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-288RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 6/25/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Proof of Service)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 8 replaced on 7/2/2019) (znmw). (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-289RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 6/25/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Proof of Service)(Kenna, Matt) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/2/2019) (znmw). (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-2810NOTICE of Appearance by Maya L. Kane on behalf of WILDERNESS SOCIETY (Kane, Maya) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-0111NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-0312RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. FOREST SERVICE served on 7/2/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USPS Proof of Service, USFS)(Kane, Maya) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar