Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-06-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6204598) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Lai, Erica) (Entered: 06/21/2019) |
2019-06-21 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Lai, Erica) (Entered: 06/21/2019) |
2019-06-21 | | Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zeg) (Entered: 06/21/2019) |
2019-06-21 | 3 | SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 06/21/2019) |
2019-07-26 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle C. Morello on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Morello, Danielle) (Entered: 07/26/2019) |
2019-07-30 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa H. Maxman on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Maxman, Melissa) (Entered: 07/30/2019) |
2019-07-30 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Alexander McGrath on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/1/2019) (znmw). (Entered: 07/30/2019) |
2019-07-31 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-08-01 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/1/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/31/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/08/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 7/5/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/5/2019; U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 7/5/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lai, Erica) (Entered: 08/01/2019) |
2019-08-07 | 9 | ORDER directing the government to produce a Vaughn Index with supporting dispositive motion by 9/9/2018. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/07/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 08/07/2019) |
2019-09-09 | 10 | Unopposed MOTION to Stay by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/09/2019) |
2019-09-09 | 11 | ERRATA re: ECF NO. 10 by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT 10 Unopposed MOTION to Stay filed by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/09/2019) |
2019-09-10 | 12 | ORDER granting 10 Motion to Stay. The Parties shall file a Joint Status Report in this matter no later than 10/09/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/10/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/10/2019) |
2019-09-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 09/11/2019) |
2019-10-09 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Lai, Erica) (Entered: 10/09/2019) |
2019-10-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit another joint status report no later than 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/21/2019. (lcrcl3) Modified on 10/28/2019 (lsj). (Entered: 10/22/2019) |
2019-11-08 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/08/2019) |
2019-11-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 12/10/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/14/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 11/14/2019) |
2019-12-10 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Lai, Erica) (Entered: 12/10/2019) |
2019-12-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 01/16/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/12/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 12/12/2019) |
2020-01-16 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Lai, Erica) (Entered: 01/16/2020) |
2020-01-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 02/18/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 01/17/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 01/17/2020) |
2020-01-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2020. (nbn) (Entered: 01/17/2020) |
2020-02-18 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lai, Erica) (Entered: 02/18/2020) |
2020-03-19 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/19/2020) |
2020-03-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the Joint Status Reports of 2/18/2020 and 3/19/2020 and will expect another no later than 4/19/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/19/2020. (lcrcl1) (Entered: 03/19/2020) |
2020-03-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/19/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 03/20/2020) |
2020-04-20 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Maxman, Melissa) (Entered: 04/20/2020) |
2020-04-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report no later than 05/20/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 04/22/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 04/22/2020) |
2020-04-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/20/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 04/22/2020) |
2020-05-20 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Morello, Danielle) (Entered: 05/20/2020) |
2020-05-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 06/22/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/21/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/21/2020) |
2020-05-29 | 21 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Danielle C. Morello terminated. (Morello, Danielle) (Entered: 05/29/2020) |
2020-06-22 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 06/22/2020) |
2020-06-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 07/22/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/25/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 06/25/2020) |
2020-07-22 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/22/2020) |
2020-07-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report no later than 08/21/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/23/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/23/2020) |
2020-08-21 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/21/2020) |
2020-08-24 | | MINUTE ORDER Status Report due by 9/21/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/24/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 08/24/2020) |
2020-09-15 | 25 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A Gonzalez on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT Substituting for attorney Benton G. Peterson (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
2020-09-21 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 09/21/2020) |
2020-09-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 10/21/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/23/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/23/2020) |
2020-10-21 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 10/21/2020) |
2020-10-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 11/23/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/27/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/27/2020) |
2020-11-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/23/2020 (lsj) (Entered: 11/04/2020) |
2020-11-20 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 11/20/2020) |
2020-11-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 12/30/2020. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/20/2020. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 11/20/2020) |
2020-12-30 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 12/30/2020) |
2021-01-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 2/1/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/25/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 01/25/2021) |
2021-02-01 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 02/01/2021) |
2021-02-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 3/2/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/3/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 02/03/2021) |
2021-03-02 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 03/02/2021) |
2021-03-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 4/2/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/3/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 03/03/2021) |
2021-04-02 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 04/02/2021) |
2021-04-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 5/3/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/6/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 04/06/2021) |
2021-04-29 | 33 | NOTICE of Appearance by Hart W. Wood on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 04/29/2021) |
2021-04-29 | 34 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Daniel Alexander McGrath terminated. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2021) |
2021-05-03 | 35 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 05/03/2021) |
2021-05-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 6/3/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/3/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/03/2021) |
2021-05-19 | 36 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Erica Courtney Lai and Melissa H. Maxman terminated. (Lai, Erica) (Entered: 05/19/2021) |
2021-06-03 | 37 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 06/03/2021) |
2021-06-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 7/2/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/3/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 06/03/2021) |
2021-07-02 | 38 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 07/02/2021) |
2021-07-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 8/3/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/6/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/06/2021) |
2021-08-03 | 39 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 08/03/2021) |
2021-08-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 9/2/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/4/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 08/04/2021) |
2021-09-02 | 40 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 09/02/2021) |
2021-09-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report no later than 10/4/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/03/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/03/2021) |
2021-10-04 | 41 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 10/04/2021) |
2021-10-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by 11/4/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/08/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/08/2021) |
2021-11-04 | 42 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 11/04/2021) |
2021-11-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 12/6/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/19/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 11/19/2021) |
2021-12-06 | 43 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 12/06/2021) |
2021-12-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 1/6/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/08/2021. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 12/08/2021) |
2022-01-06 | 44 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 01/06/2022) |
2022-01-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by 2/7/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/06/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 01/06/2022) |
2022-02-07 | 45 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 02/07/2022) |
2022-02-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by 3/7/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/10/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 02/10/2022) |
2022-02-22 | 46 | NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 02/22/2022) |
2022-02-22 | 47 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Status Report by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 02/22/2022) |
2022-02-24 | 48 | ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/24/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 02/24/2022) |
2022-05-02 | 49 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. Attorney Douglas C. Dreier terminated. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 05/02/2022) |
2022-05-04 | 50 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 05/04/2022) |
2022-05-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by 7/6/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/11/2022) |
2022-07-06 | 51 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 07/06/2022) |
2022-07-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a further Joint Status Report by 9/7/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/6/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/06/2022) |
2022-09-07 | 52 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 09/07/2022) |
2022-09-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further status report by 11/07/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/09/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/09/2022) |
2022-10-27 | 53 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 10/27/2022) |
2022-10-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by 01/06/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/28/2022. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/28/2022) |
2023-01-06 | 54 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-01-09 | | MINUTE ORDER; Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by 03/06/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 01/09/2023. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 01/09/2023) |
2023-03-06 | 55 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 03/06/2023) |
2023-03-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by 05/05/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/10/2023. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 03/10/2023) |
2023-05-05 | 56 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 05/05/2023) |
2023-05-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by 07/05/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/26/2023. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/26/2023) |
2023-06-30 | 57 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-07-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: Counsel are advised that this case will be reportable on 09/30/2023 as having been pending for more than three years. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by 08/01/2023, in which they should suggest steps to take to ensure termination before the end of September. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/10/2023. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/10/2023) |
2023-07-11 | 58 | NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Stoneman on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Stoneman, Taylor) (Main Document 58 replaced on 7/12/2023) (znmw). (Entered: 07/11/2023) |
2023-07-13 | 59 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Hart W. Wood terminated. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 07/13/2023) |
2023-08-01 | 60 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Stoneman, Taylor) (Entered: 08/01/2023) |
2023-08-31 | 61 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Stoneman, Taylor) (Entered: 08/31/2023) |
2023-09-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by 09/20/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/01/2023. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/01/2023) |
2023-09-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2023. (zsmc) (Entered: 09/05/2023) |
2023-09-20 | 62 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 09/20/2023) |
2023-09-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to file a further Joint Status Report by 10/20/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/27/2023. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/27/2023) |
2023-10-20 | 63 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Stoneman, Taylor) (Entered: 10/20/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |