Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMOELLER v. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01821
Date Filed2019-06-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJAMES W. MOELLER
Case DescriptionJames Moeller submitted a FOIA request to the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission for records concerning an age discrimination complaint filed with the agency by Ralph Devito against Infosys in or about 2009. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied the request under Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Moeller filed an administrative appeal of the denial. The agency upheld its original decision on appeal. Moeller then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantEQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-211COMPLAINT against EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616099080) filed by JAMES W. MOELLER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-21Summons (1) Issued as to EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION. (ztd) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-092NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar