Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAdhikaar et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv05881
Date Filed2019-06-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Gregory H. Woods
PlaintiffAdhikaar
PlaintiffNew York Immigration Coalition
Case DescriptionAdhikaar and the New York Immigration Coalition submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of State for records concerning the agency's decision to terminate the temporary protective status for Nepalese nationals. Adhikaar and the New York Immigration Coalition also requested a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. After the agencies failed to respond, Adhikaar and the New York Immigration Coalition filed administrative appeals pertaining to the agencies' failure to respond. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Adhikaar and the New Yortk Immigration Coalition filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Department of State
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-241COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17125962)Document filed by Adhikaar, New York Immigration Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Handley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-242FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Handley, Matthew) Modified on 6/25/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-243FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adhikaar, New York Immigration Coalition. (Handley, Matthew) Modified on 6/25/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-244FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adhikaar, New York Immigration Coalition. (Handley, Matthew) Modified on 6/25/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-245FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adhikaar, New York Immigration Coalition. (Handley, Matthew) Modified on 6/25/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-246FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adhikaar, New York Immigration Coalition. (Handley, Matthew) Modified on 6/25/2019 (jgo). (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-247RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Adhikaar.(Handley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-248RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Immigration Coalition.(Handley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-25***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Matthew Keith Handley to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-25CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (jgo) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-25Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (jgo) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-25Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-25***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Matthew Keith Handley to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 6 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons, 3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the PDF 'To' section does not exactly match initial pleading caption; second party name on the PDF 'To' section must include 'care of c/o' or 'via';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-259CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Handley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-2510REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adhikaar, New York Immigration Coalition. (Handley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-2511REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adhikaar, New York Immigration Coalition. (Handley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-2512REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adhikaar, New York Immigration Coalition. (Handley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-2513REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adhikaar, New York Immigration Coalition. (Handley, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-2614ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (dnh) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-2615ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (dnh) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-2616ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State. (dnh) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-2617ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (dnh) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-07-0918NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/9/2019) (ne) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-1019SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; United States Department of State served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Adhikaar; New York Immigration Coalition. (Handley, Matthew) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-1920NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Ann Jude on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Jude, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar