Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01857
Date Filed2019-06-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior and the Department of Agriculture for records concerning communications pertaining to the Bureau of Land Management's decision to renew mining leases of Twin Metals Minnesota near the Boundary Waters Canoe Area Wilderness in Minnesota. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The Agriculture Department disclosed 23 pages as part of a partial response. However, after hearing nothing further from either agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantBUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DefendantU.S. FOREST SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-251COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FOREST SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6211957) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USAO, # 3 Summons U.S. Att'y General, # 4 Summons Dep't of the Interior, # 5 Summons Bureau of Land Management, # 6 Summons Dep't of Agriculture, # 7 Summons Forest Service)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-26Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zeg) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-06-263SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FOREST SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
2019-07-094NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FOREST SERVICE (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar