Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLATHAM & WATKINS LLP v. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01867
Date Filed2019-06-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffLATHAM & WATKINS LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Latham Watkins submitted two FOIA requests to the FDA. The first request asked for records concerning any new drug application containing amifampridine. The second FOIA request asked for records concerning any new drug applications for amifampridine submitted by Jacobus Pharmaceutical or Catalyst Pharmaceutical. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. Latham Watkins told the agency that it was aware that some responsive records pertaining to Jacobus and Catalyst applications were available on the agency's website and would be considered responsive to its request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Latham Watkins filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-251COMPLAINT against U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6212720) filed by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons to FDA, # 7 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 8 Summons to U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-252LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LATHAM & WATKINS LLP (Prins, Andrew) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-253NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan S. Baasch on behalf of LATHAM & WATKINS LLP (Baasch, Ryan) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2019-06-27Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-06-274SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-07-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/28/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/28/2019. (Baasch, Ryan) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar