Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01927
Date Filed2019-06-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action Institute submitted a FOIA request to the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for records concerning an omnibus amendment proposed by the National Marine Fisheries Service that would require fishermen to pay for at-sea monitoring of Atlantic cod. Cause of Action Institute also requested a fee waiver and inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided 28 pages as part of its first interim release and eight pages in its second interim disclosure. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Cause of Action Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-271COMPLAINT against NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6219248) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons NOAA, # 8 Summons USAG, # 9 Summons USAO-DC)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-06-272LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-07-01Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zeg) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL OCEANIC AND ATMOSPHERIC ADMINISTRATION served on 7/2/2019 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/2/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/1/2019. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-036NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-087ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA re 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/3/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/2/2019. (Mulvey, Ryan) Modified event title on 7/11/2019 (znmw). Modified on 7/11/2019 (zrdj). (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-118RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7-3-2019. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-11NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 7 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error at the request of counsel and counsel was refiled as pleading 8 . (zrdj) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar