Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMONTOYA LAW, P.A. v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01931
Date Filed2019-06-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffMONTOYA LAW, P.A.
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Montoya Law P.A. submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the investigation and prosecution of Odebrecht S.A. and Branskem S.A. in the Eastern District of New York. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request entirely under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Montoya Law filed an administrative appeal. The FBI denied the appeal. Montoya Law then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
935 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20535
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-271COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6219547) filed by MONTOYA LAW, P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4)(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-07-032ERRATA re Civil Cover Sheet by MONTOYA LAW, P.A. 1 Complaint, filed by MONTOYA LAW, P.A.. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-03Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-033ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) Modified on 7/18/2019 (zeg). (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-18NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error. Incorrect summons requested and issued. Attorney notified to request correct summonses. (zeg) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar