Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01943
Date Filed2019-06-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffCOMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA
Case DescriptionThe Communications Workers of America submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Labor for records concerning the creation of the customer service representative standard occupation series for the revision of the Service Contract Act Directory of Occupations. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests. It denied one of the requests on the basis of Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). CWA filed an administrative appeal of the denial. After hearing nothing further pertaining to either request, CWA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
200 Constitution Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20210
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-281COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6221108) filed by COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons (U.S. Attorney), # 3 Summons (Attorney General), # 4 Summons (Agency))(Llewellyn, Patrick) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/2/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-283NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Pulver on behalf of COMMUNICATIONS WORKERS OF AMERICA (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-02Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zeg) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-024SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/2/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/1/2019. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General July 8, 2019. (Llewellyn, Patrick) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar