Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01949
Date Filed2019-06-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications between Manual Miranda and political appointees in five named DOJ offices. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-281COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6223229) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (France, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-02Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zjd) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-124NOTICE of Appearance by Christine H. Monahan on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar