Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY v. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01951
Date Filed2019-06-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Food Safety submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning the agency's recently announced final rule titled "Child Nutrition Programs: Flexibilities in Milk, Whole Grains, and Sodium." The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CFS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-281COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6224012) filed by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Attorney General, # 3 Summons for U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons for Defendant)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-283MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Victoria Yundt, :Firm- Center for Food Safety, :Address- 303 Sacramento St., 2nd Flr., San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-826-2770. Fax No. - 415-826-0507 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6224061. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victoria Yundt, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-02Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zjd) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-024SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-025STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 2, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-03MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's 3 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice . Victoria Yundt may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 3, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar