Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMAGASSA v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01952
Date Filed2019-06-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffLASSANA MAGASSA
Case DescriptionLassana Magassa submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning himself. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request. The FBI disclosed 19 heavily redacted pages. Magassa filed an administrative appeal with the Office of Information Policy. OIP upheld the FBI's initial decision. Magassa then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
935 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20535
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-281COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6224063) filed by Lassana Magassa. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Requests for Summons)(Jump, Christina) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-02Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zjd) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-022SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-103RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 7/10/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/8/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/7/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service, # 3 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Jump, Christina) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-114GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/11/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar