Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01958
Date Filed2019-06-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Food Safety submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning the status of the organization's two pesticide petitions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CFS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-281COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6224305) filed by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Attorney General, # 3 Summons for U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons for Defendant)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-06-283MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Victoria Yundt, :Firm- Center for Food Safety, :Address- 303 Sacramento Street, 2nd Fl, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-826-2770. Fax No. - 415-826-0507 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6224311. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration for Yundt, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-02Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-024SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-09MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Yundt does not categorically certify in her declaration that she "either has or has not been disciplined by any bar" as required by LCvR 83.2(d)(4). Rather, she represents only that she is "currently in good standing with all states, courts, and bars in which [she] is admitted." Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/9/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-095MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Victoria Yundt, :Firm- Center for Food Safety, :Address- 303 Sacramento St., 2nd Flr., San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-826-2770. Fax No. - 415-826-0507 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victoria Yundt, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-09MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. Attorney Victoria Yundt is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/9/2019. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-166NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar