Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHusch Blackwell LLP v. Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2019cv00880
Date Filed2019-07-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Anthony J Trenga
PlaintiffHusch Blackwell LLP
DefendantWashington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-011Complaint against Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6718613.), filed by Husch Blackwell LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Waagner, Brian) Modified text on 7/1/2019 (klau, ). (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-012Proposed Summons by Husch Blackwell LLP. (Waagner, Brian) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-013Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Husch Blackwell LLP. (Waagner, Brian) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-01Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-024Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(klau, ) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-115SUMMONS Returned Executed by Husch Blackwell LLP as to Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority served on 7/10/2019, answer due 8/9/2019 (Waagner, Brian) Modified on 7/12/2019 to correct answer due date (klau, ). (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-246NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Paul Waagner on behalf of Husch Blackwell LLP (Waagner, Brian) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-25Notice of Correction re 6 Notice of Appearance, The signature block (George E. Stewart) on the document does not match the user's login. The filing user has been notified and has been asked to either refile the document or to have the attorney whose signature block appears on the document refile the document. (klau, ) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
2019-07-297NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Paul Waagner on behalf of Husch Blackwell LLP (Waagner, Brian) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-29Notice of Correction re 7 Notice of Appearance, The signature block (George E. Stewart) on the document does not match the user's login. The filing user has been notified to have Mr. Stewart use his own login password to file notice of appearance. (klau, ) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-298NOTICE of Appearance by George Edward Stewart, III on behalf of Husch Blackwell LLP (Stewart, George) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-08-099NOTICE of Appearance by Attison Leonard Barnes, III on behalf of Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority (Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-0910ANSWER to Complaint by Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority.(Barnes, Attison) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-1211SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/12/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent, # 2 Pretrial Notice)(rban, ) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar