Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01981
Date Filed2019-07-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffLAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW
Case DescriptionThe Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law submitted four FOIA requests to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau pertaining to changes in fair lending policies. The Lawyers Committee also requested fee waivers. The agency provided thousands of pages in response to several of the requests, but the Lawyers Committee was ultimately unsatisfied with the agency's responses and filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-021COMPLAINT against Consumer Financial Protection Bureau ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6231273) filed by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-21, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(McCarthy, John) Modified on 7/3/2019 to correct text(zrdj). (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-082ERRATA and Revised Civil Cover Sheet by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW 1 Complaint, filed by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarthy, John) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-08Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zeg) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-08SUMMONS Not Issued as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (zeg) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-113ERRATA and Revised Proposed Summons by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW 1 Complaint, filed by LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW. (Attachments: # 1 Summons (Proposed))(McCarthy, John) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar