Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2019cv03038
Date Filed2019-07-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Leigh Martin May
PlaintiffSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Southeastern Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications between the intelligence community and the FBI pertaining to the Steele dossier. SLF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The FBI split SLF's request into two requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, SLF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-021COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8768970) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-022Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (bdb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-023Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 U. S. Attorney's Office, # 2 U. S. Dept. of Justice)(bdb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-08Clerks Notation re 2 Certificate of Interested Persons, reviewed and approved by LMM. (rvb) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-104STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/10/2019. (tmf) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar