Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSCOVILLE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01987
Date Filed2019-07-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffRYAN SCOVILLE
Case DescriptionRyan Scoville, an academic researcher, submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of State. His first request asked for records concerning presidential reports submitted to the Senate Foreign Relations Committee pursuant to statute since 1980. His second FOIA request asked for Chief of Mission Leadership Surveys since 2012. His third FOIA request was for the number of agreements withheld from publication since 1994. The agency acknowledged receipt of Scoville's requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Scoville filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-031COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6233145) filed by RYAN SCOVILLE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-032NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of RYAN SCOVILLE (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-05Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zjd) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-084STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/8/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar