Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEDDINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv01991
Date Filed2019-07-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffPATRICK EDDINGTON
Case DescriptionPatrick Eddington, a researcher at the Cato Institute, submitted a FOIA request to the National Security Division of the Department of Justice for records concerning Amir Mohamed Meshal, a U.S. citizen who was held captive by both Kenya and Ethiopia. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Eddington that it would not process his request without an authorization from Meshal and if Eddington did not provide such a waiver it would close his request. Eddington then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-031COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6233947) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-032NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-05Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zrdj) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-084GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/8/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar