Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02002
Date Filed2019-07-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffCENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Food Safety submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning communications between acting administrator Andrew Wheeler or other officials and Monsanto regarding XtendiMax. CFS also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted CFS's request for a fee waiver and asked CFS to clarify its request. CFS did so. The agency indicated that its search had yielded 2,849 pages of potentially responsive records. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CFS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-031COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6235115) filed by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Attorney General, # 3 Summons for U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons for Defendant)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-032LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-033MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Victoria Yundt, :Firm- Center for Food Safety, :Address- 303 Sacramento Street, 2nd Fl, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-826-2770. Fax No. - 415-826-0507 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6235118. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration for Yundt, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-05Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zrdj) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-054SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-12MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to comply with the specific requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), in particular subpart (4) which requires a certification that the attorney either has or has not been disciplined by any bar and the circumstances of any discipline. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/12/19. (DMK) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-125MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Victoria Yundt, :Firm- Center for Food Safety, :Address- 303 Sacramento St., 2nd Flr., San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-826-2770. Fax No. - 415-826-0507 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Victoria Yundt, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimbrell, George) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-15MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave of Victoria Yundt to Appear Pro Hac Vice only upon condition that the lawyer admitted, or at least one member of the lawyer's firm, undergo CM/ECF training, obtain a CM/ECF username and password, and agree to file papers electronically. No court papers will be mailed to any lawyer. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/15/19. (DMK) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar