Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBRYANT v. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02004
Date Filed2019-07-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffJAMES B. BRYANT
Case DescriptionJames Bryant submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Navy for records regarding the investigation of the sinking of the submarine Thresher. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After the agency failed to respond, Bryant filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Bryant filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-051COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6235322) filed by JAMES B BRYANT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eatinger, Robert) (Entered: 07/05/2019)
2019-07-08Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zeg) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-08SUMMONS Not Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (zeg) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-082REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JAMES B BRYANT. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Corrected Summons Form, # 2 Summons Corrected Summons Form)(Eatinger, Robert); Modified on 7/9/2019, Entered in Error was removed. (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-083STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/8/2019. (lctnm2) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-094REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE with corrected address re 1 Complaint filed by JAMES B BRYANT. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by JAMES B BRYANT.(Eatinger, Robert) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-09ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 2 Request for Summons to Issue was entered in error at the request of counsel. Said pleading was refiled as docket entry 4 . (tth) Modified on 7/11/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-09NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Notice of Corrected Docket Entry was entered in error. (tth) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-095SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent) (tth) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-116RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/9/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/8/2019. (Eatinger, Robert) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-117RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY served on 7/9/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/09/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Eatinger, Robert) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-118RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Eatinger, Robert) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-159NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua L. Rogers on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-08-0510ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Rogers, Joshua) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-05MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before September 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 08/05/2019. (lctnm1) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2019. (hmc) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar