Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES v. US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02029
Date Filed2019-07-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffCENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES
Case DescriptionThe Center for Immigration Studies submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records containing an array of data points for various agency offices. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CIS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-101COMPLAINT against US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6243529) filed by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Defendant, # 3 Summons for Attorney General, # 4 Summons for US Attorney)(Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
2019-07-11Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zeg) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-112SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-113LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-08-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/23/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/22/2019. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/23/2019. (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 7/24/2019 (Axelrod, Julie) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar