Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02064
Date Filed2019-07-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Government Accountability Project submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning communications containing specific keywords. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told GAP that it was processing the requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, GAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
200 Independence Avenue, S.W.
Washington, DC 20201
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-111COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6248542), CIVIL COVER SHEET by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT, REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gray, Karen) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-112REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint,, Cover Sheet,, Request for Summons to Issue, filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. Related document: 1 Complaint,, Cover Sheet,, Request for Summons to Issue, filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT.(Gray, Karen) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-123NOTICE of Attachments to Complaint by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Gray, Karen) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-12Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zeg) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-124SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-125STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/12/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar