Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleERICSSON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02075
Date Filed2019-07-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffSUZANNE ERICSSON
Case DescriptionSuzanne Ericsson submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning her. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Ericsson that it had located 376 pages responsive to her request. However, the agency disclosed only 18 documents in full and six documents in part, claiming Exemption 3 (other statutes). Ericsson filed an administrative appeal of the agency's denial. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Ericsson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6251052) filed by SUZANNE ERICSSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Hampe, Carl) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-16Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-16SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, US Attorney, and US Attorney General (zsb) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-162ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by SUZANNE ERICSSON. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by SUZANNE ERICSSON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Pierce, Daniel) Modified on 7/17/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-17NOTICE OF ERROR re 2 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to dpierce@fragomen.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Summonses for FIOA case need to be submitted. The summonses attached are incorrect. (ztd, ) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-173REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by SUZANNE ERICSSON. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by SUZANNE ERICSSON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons AG, # 2 Summons AUSA)(Pierce, Daniel) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-184SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (znmw) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-195NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Pierce on behalf of SUZANNE ERICSSON (Pierce, Daniel) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/22/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/21/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Delivery - Attorney General Barr, # 2 Affidavit of Delivery - Department of State)(Pierce, Daniel) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-238RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/22/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/22/2019. (See Docket Entry 6 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-07-257NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar