Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCiuffetelli v. Farm Credit East, ACA et. al.
DistrictEastern District of New York
CityCentral Islip
Case Number2:2019cv04047
Date Filed2019-07-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Brian M. Cogan
PlaintiffRalph B. Ciuffetelli
Case DescriptionRalph Ciuffetelli requested records concerning a land appraisal from Farm Credit East. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantFarm Credit East, ACA
DefendantPatrick K. Wiles
DefendantSandra M. Pearson
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-121COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11659142 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Ralph B. Ciuffetelli. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Letter dated June 21, 2017, # 2 Exhibit B- July 19, 2017 Denial, # 3 Exhibit C- Letter dated November 30, 2017, # 4 Exhibit D- Letter dated December 6, 2017, # 5 Exhibit E- April 27, 2018 Denial, # 6 Exhibit F- Gfeller E-mail Correspondence, # 7 Exhibit G- Plaintiff's FOIA, # 8 Exhibit H- Defendant FCE's FOIA Denial, # 9 Exhibit I- FCA FOIA response, # 10 Exhibit J- Agans E-mail Correspondence, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet) (Campanelli, Andrew) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-122Proposed Summons. by Ralph B. Ciuffetelli (Campanelli, Andrew) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-123Proposed Summons. by Ralph B. Ciuffetelli (Campanelli, Andrew) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-124Proposed Summons. by Ralph B. Ciuffetelli (Campanelli, Andrew) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-125NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rose Disken on behalf of Ralph B. Ciuffetelli (aty to be noticed) (Disken, Amanda) (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-12Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Doudalis, Evelyn) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-156This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Doudalis, Evelyn) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-157In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Doudalis, Evelyn) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-158Summons Issued as to Farm Credit East, ACA, Sandra M. Pearson, Patrick K. Wiles. (Doudalis, Evelyn) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-159MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Ralph B. Ciuffetelli. (Disken, Amanda) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-1510SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 8/28/2019 at 10:45 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/15/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-1611APPLICATION 9 for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically APPROVED by August Marziliano, Operations Manager on 7/16/2019. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-08-0112NOTICE of Appearance by Elliott A Hallak on behalf of Farm Credit East, ACA, Sandra M. Pearson, Patrick K. Wiles (notification declined or already on case) (Hallak, Elliott) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-0113MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by Farm Credit East, ACA, Sandra M. Pearson, Patrick K. Wiles. (Hallak, Elliott) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-01ORDER granting 13 . Defendants' answer due by 8/23/2019. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/1/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-0514SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph B. Ciuffetelli. Farm Credit East, ACA served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Campanelli, Andrew) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-0515SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph B. Ciuffetelli. Patrick K. Wiles served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Campanelli, Andrew) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-0516SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph B. Ciuffetelli. Sandra M. Pearson served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Campanelli, Andrew) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar