Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFidell v. Army
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2019cv01069
Date Filed2019-07-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Kari A. Dooley
PlaintiffEugene R. Fidell
Case DescriptionEugene Fidell, an attorney, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Army for records concerning the agency's determination pertaining to his client. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Fidell filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDept of Army
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-091COMPLAINT against Dept of Army, filed by Eugene R. Fidell. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-09Filing fee received from Eugene Fidell: $400, receipt number CTXN00019603 (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-09Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Dept of Army. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-092ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/9/2019.(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-093STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/9/2019.(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-164NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint filed by Eugene R. Fidell, 2 Electronic Filing Order, 3 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 7/16/2019.(Reis, Julia) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-165ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Dept of Army* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Stephen Wizner* *49 McKinley Avenue* *New Haven, CT 06515*. (Reis, Julia) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar