Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMunger v. Social Security Administration
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2019cv01088
Date Filed2019-07-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard A. Jones
PlaintiffMatthew Munger by and through his attorney-in-fact
other Michael Munger
Case DescriptionMatthew Munger's attorney submitted a FOIA request to the Social Security Administration for records concerning an accident at a Social Security Administration office in which Munger slipped and fell and was paralyzed as a result. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Munger's attorney filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantSocial Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-151COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs Social Security Administration (Receipt # 0981-5845374) Attorney Brandon K. Batchelor added to party Matthew Munger(pty:pla), Attorney Brandon K. Batchelor added to party Michael Munger(pty:pla), filed by Matthew Munger, Michael Munger. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Batchelor, Brandon) Modified on 7/16/2019 (KB). (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-16Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-162Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Social Security Administration (SNP) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-223AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on US Attorney US ATG - Wa on 7/19/2019, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Munger. (Batchelor, Brandon) Modified docket text on 7/22/2019 (MW). (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-07-224AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Social Security Admin on 7/18/2019, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Munger. (Batchelor, Brandon) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-07-265AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States Attorney Generals Office on 7/30/2019, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Munger. (Batchelor, Brandon) (Entered: 07/26/2019)
2019-07-306AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on US Attorney Generals Office on 7/23/2019, filed by Plaintiff Matthew Munger. (Batchelor, Brandon) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar