Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2019cv03215
Date Filed2019-07-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jean-Paul Boulee
PlaintiffSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Southeastern Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning whether any attorney was disciplined for requesting the FISA warrant to surveil Carter Page. SLF also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, SLF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-161COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-8795019) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-162Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice. (eop) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-163Electronic Summons Issued as to William P. Barr. (eop) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-164Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Attorney's Office. (eop) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-165Certificate of Interested Persons by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-316Return of Service Executed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. United States Department of Justice served on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Department of Justice, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Exhibit Proof of Service to U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-067Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response re: 1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Samuel) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar