Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNorris et al v. United States Army
DistrictDistrict of Kansas
CityTopeka
Case Number5:2019cv04057
Date Filed2019-07-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Holly L. Teeter
PlaintiffBrittney Norris as mother and natural parent of
minor W. N.
PlaintiffZachary Norris as father and natural parent of
minor W. N.
DefendantUnited States Army Secretary Department of the Army
DefendantUnited States Army
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-161NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Geary County District Court, case number 2019-MV-000028 Trial location of Topeka, filed by United States Army.(Allman, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: # 1 Redacted Main Document) (jal). (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-162CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant United States Army. (Allman, Christopher) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-163DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant United States Army - trial to be held in Topeka. (Allman, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: # 1 Redacted Main Document) (jal). (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-164CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, and Designation of Place of Trial as Amended by United States Army re 1 Notice of Removal, 2 Civil Cover Sheet, 3 Designation of Place of Trial. (Allman, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: # 1 Redacted Main Document) (jal). (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-16NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-225MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant United States Army (Allman, Christopher) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-07-226MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant United States Army(Allman, Christopher) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-07-227ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Wendy A. Lynn on behalf of United States Army (Lynn, Wendy) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-08-058STATE COURT RECORDS from Geary County District Court. (Allman, Christopher) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar