Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02119
Date Filed2019-07-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning emails sent to or from Secretary Betsy DeVos and/or her staff from non-government accounts. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told American Oversight that it would be unable to respond within the 20-day statutory deadline. American Oversight then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6258615) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-18Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zeg) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-08-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/19/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/18/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/23/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 7/22/2019 (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 08/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar