Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleREPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02125
Date Filed2019-07-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffREPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Case DescriptionThe Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning a meeting on international religious freedom in which Secretary Mike Pompeo participated. The Reporters Committee also asked for inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Reporters Committee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-171COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6259911) filed by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons for Defendant, # 6 Summons for U.S. Attorney, # 7 Summons for U.S. Attorney General)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/18/2019) (zeg). (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-07-18Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zeg) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-182SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-293RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/23/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/22/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/23/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/23/2019. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar