Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02131
Date Filed2019-07-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted FOIA requests to OMB and the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning communications between agency officials pertaining to Novartis and related entities and individuals. DFF also requested a fee waiver from both agencies. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. OMB asked DFF to narrow its request. DFF responded by making some suggestions but heard nothing further from the agency. CMS asked DFF to provide more information, which DFF did. After hearing nothing further from either agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-181COMPLAINT against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6261433) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Seel, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-182LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION (Seel, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-18Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zjd) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-183SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-08-054RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/22/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES served on 7/22/2019; OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 8/5/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/22/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/21/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Seel, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-155NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar