Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWESTERN VALUES PROJECT v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02138
Date Filed2019-07-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffWESTERN VALUES PROJECT
Case DescriptionWestern Values Project submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning correspondence. All of its requests were subject to the Awareness policy allowing agency officials to review responses to FOIA requests before release. Western Values Project also requested a fee waiver for its requests. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Western Values Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-181COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6263079) filed by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Supplement Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1, # 3 Summons US Dept of Interior Summons, # 4 Summons US Attorney General Summons, # 5 Summons US Attorney for DC Summons, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C)(Massey, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-192ERRATA by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT 1 Complaint, filed by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Errata)(Massey, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-193LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (Massey, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-07-22Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zeg) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-07-224SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-07-225STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/22/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
2019-08-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 7/29/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/30/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/30/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/29/2019.) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(Massey, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-077NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 08/07/2019)
2019-08-088NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Collette on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Collette, Matthew) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-099Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion for extension of time 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond on or before September 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/9/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/19/2019. (kt) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar